Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 9, 2021
Bill January 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 8, 2021
Bill May 7, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021
Analysis March 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 9, 2021