House
|
05/26/2021
|
File Number 725
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 488
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9145
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
File Number 428
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
House Calendar Number 320
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|