Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Bill January 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 25, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021