House | 07/12/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/24/2021 | Public Act 21-154 | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | File Number 631 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 387 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7702 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | File Number 25 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | House Calendar Number 55 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |