Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 9, 2021
Bill February 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 26, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021
Analysis March 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021