House
|
05/20/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Public Act 21-12
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
File Number 632
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 378
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7954
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
File Number 201
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
House Calendar Number 172
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|