Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 16, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 18, 2021