Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Public Act 21-155
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 576
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
File Number 134
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
House Calendar Number 128
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|