Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 23, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021