House
|
06/04/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Public Act 21-22
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
File Number 633
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 382
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7488
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6771
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
File Number 382
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
House Calendar Number 295
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/09
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|