Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 23, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 1, 2021