House | 03/16/2021 | File Number 53 | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | House Calendar Number 76 | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |