14 | | - | Section 1. Section 12-81w of the general statutes is repealed and the |
---|
15 | | - | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021, and |
---|
16 | | - | applicable to assessment years commencing on or after October 1, 2021): |
---|
17 | | - | The legislative body of any municipality may establish, by ordinance, |
---|
18 | | - | a program to provide property tax relief for a nonsalaried local |
---|
19 | | - | emergency management director, any individual who volunteers his or |
---|
20 | | - | her services as a firefighter, fire police officer, as defined in subsection |
---|
21 | | - | (a) of section 7-308, emergency medical technician, paramedic, civil |
---|
22 | | - | preparedness staff, active member of a volunteer canine search and |
---|
23 | | - | rescue team, as defined in section 5-249, active member of a volunteer |
---|
24 | | - | underwater search and rescue team, or ambulance driver in the |
---|
25 | | - | municipality, or any individual who is a retired volunteer firefighter, |
---|
26 | | - | fire police officer or emergency medical technician and has completed |
---|
27 | | - | at least twenty-five years of service as a volunteer firefighter, fire police |
---|
28 | | - | officer or emergency medical technician in the municipality. Such tax |
---|
29 | | - | relief may provide either (1) [(A) for the period commencing July 1, 2019, |
---|
30 | | - | and ending June 30, 2021, an abatement of up to one thousand five |
---|
31 | | - | hundred dollars in property taxes due for any fiscal year, and (B) on and House Bill No. 6420 |
---|
| 26 | + | Section 1. Section 12-81w of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
| 27 | + | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2021, and 2 |
---|
| 28 | + | applicable to assessment years commencing on or after October 1, 2021): 3 |
---|
| 29 | + | The legislative body of any municipality may establish, by ordinance, 4 |
---|
| 30 | + | a program to provide property tax relief for a nonsalaried local 5 |
---|
| 31 | + | emergency management director, any individual who volunteers his or 6 |
---|
| 32 | + | her services as a firefighter, fire police officer, as defined in subsection 7 |
---|
| 33 | + | (a) of section 7-308, emergency medical technician, paramedic, civil 8 |
---|
| 34 | + | preparedness staff, active member of a volunteer canine search and 9 |
---|
| 35 | + | rescue team, as defined in section 5-249, active member of a volunteer 10 |
---|
| 36 | + | underwater search and rescue team, or ambulance driver in the 11 |
---|
| 37 | + | municipality, or any individual who is a retired volunteer firefighter, 12 |
---|
| 38 | + | fire police officer or emergency medical technician and has completed 13 |
---|
| 39 | + | at least twenty-five years of service as a volunteer firefighter, fire police 14 Raised Bill No. 6420 |
---|
35 | | - | after July 1, 2021,] an abatement of up to two thousand dollars in |
---|
36 | | - | property taxes due for any fiscal year, or (2) an exemption applicable to |
---|
37 | | - | the assessed value of real or personal property up to an amount equal |
---|
38 | | - | to the quotient of [one] two million dollars divided by the mill rate, in |
---|
39 | | - | effect at the time of assessment, expressed as a whole number of dollars |
---|
40 | | - | per one thousand dollars of assessed value. Any ordinance may |
---|
41 | | - | authorize interlocal agreements for the purpose of providing property |
---|
42 | | - | tax relief to such volunteers who live in one municipality but volunteer |
---|
43 | | - | or volunteered their services in another municipality. |
---|
| 42 | + | LCO 3264 {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06420- |
---|
| 43 | + | R01-HB.docx } |
---|
| 44 | + | 2 of 2 |
---|
| 45 | + | |
---|
| 46 | + | officer or emergency medical technician in the municipality. Such tax 15 |
---|
| 47 | + | relief may provide either (1) (A) [for the period commencing] beginning 16 |
---|
| 48 | + | July 1, 2019, and ending [June 30] September 30, 2021, an abatement of 17 |
---|
| 49 | + | up to one thousand five hundred dollars in property taxes due for any 18 |
---|
| 50 | + | fiscal year, and (B) [on and after July 1] beginning October 1, 2021, an 19 |
---|
| 51 | + | abatement of up to two thousand dollars in property taxes due for any 20 |
---|
| 52 | + | fiscal year, or (2) an exemption applicable to the assessed value of real 21 |
---|
| 53 | + | or personal property up to an amount equal to the quotient of [one] two 22 |
---|
| 54 | + | million dollars divided by the mill rate, in effect at the time of 23 |
---|
| 55 | + | assessment, expressed as a whole number of dollars per one thousand 24 |
---|
| 56 | + | dollars of assessed value. Any ordinance may authorize interlocal 25 |
---|
| 57 | + | agreements for the purpose of providing property tax relief to such 26 |
---|
| 58 | + | volunteers who live in one municipality but volunteer or volunteered 27 |
---|
| 59 | + | their services in another municipality. 28 |
---|
| 60 | + | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
| 61 | + | sections: |
---|
| 62 | + | |
---|
| 63 | + | Section 1 October 1, 2021, and |
---|
| 64 | + | applicable to assessment |
---|
| 65 | + | years commencing on or |
---|
| 66 | + | after October 1, 2021 |
---|
| 67 | + | 12-81w |
---|
| 68 | + | |
---|
| 69 | + | PD Joint Favorable |
---|