Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06420 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/16/2021

                             
 
 
House Bill No. 6420 
 
Public Act No. 21-83 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION FOR 
CERTAIN MUNICIPAL VOLUNTEERS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 12-81w of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021, and 
applicable to assessment years commencing on or after October 1, 2021): 
The legislative body of any municipality may establish, by ordinance, 
a program to provide property tax relief for a nonsalaried local 
emergency management director, any individual who volunteers his or 
her services as a firefighter, fire police officer, as defined in subsection 
(a) of section 7-308, emergency medical technician, paramedic, civil 
preparedness staff, active member of a volunteer canine search and 
rescue team, as defined in section 5-249, active member of a volunteer 
underwater search and rescue team, or ambulance driver in the 
municipality, or any individual who is a retired volunteer firefighter, 
fire police officer or emergency medical technician and has completed 
at least twenty-five years of service as a volunteer firefighter, fire police 
officer or emergency medical technician in the municipality. Such tax 
relief may provide either (1) [(A) for the period commencing July 1, 2019, 
and ending June 30, 2021, an abatement of up to one thousand five 
hundred dollars in property taxes due for any fiscal year, and (B) on and  House Bill No. 6420 
 
Public Act No. 21-83 	2 of 2 
 
after July 1, 2021,] an abatement of up to two thousand dollars in 
property taxes due for any fiscal year, or (2) an exemption applicable to 
the assessed value of real or personal property up to an amount equal 
to the quotient of [one] two million dollars divided by the mill rate, in 
effect at the time of assessment, expressed as a whole number of dollars 
per one thousand dollars of assessed value. Any ordinance may 
authorize interlocal agreements for the purpose of providing property 
tax relief to such volunteers who live in one municipality but volunteer 
or volunteered their services in another municipality.