Senate | 06/02/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 543 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | File Number 261 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | House Calendar Number 215 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |