House | 04/28/2021 | File Number 624 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 365 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7531 | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | File Number 135 | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | House Calendar Number 129 | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |