Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06433 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021