House
|
07/12/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2021
|
Special Act 21-26
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
File Number 749
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 509
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9243
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
File Number 120
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
House Calendar Number 119
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|