Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 26, 2021
Bill May 11, 2021
Bill March 24, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021