Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Public Act 21-152
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 573
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10440
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
File Number 203
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
House Calendar Number 174
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|