Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note June 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 24, 2021
Analysis June 8, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021