House
|
06/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Public Act 21-84
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
File Number 771
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9371
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
File Number 385
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
House Calendar Number 298
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|