Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06458 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2021
Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill February 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 27, 2021
Analysis June 1, 2021
Analysis May 28, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2021