Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 570
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10073
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
File Number 303
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
House Calendar Number 235
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|