Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 8, 2021
Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021
Bill February 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis June 8, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021