House | 04/26/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | File Number 387 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 300 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |