House | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Transportation | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |