Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06483 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill February 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 31, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2021