House | 03/31/2021 | File Number 228 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | House Calendar Number 189 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |