Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06498 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/23/2021

                                
 
LCO No. 3306  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6498  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3306 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ENV)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E SITING OF CERTAIN SOLAR FACILITIES 
ON FARMLANDS AND COR E FORESTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 16-50k of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
(a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of section 16-50z, no person 3 
shall exercise any right of eminent domain in contemplation of, 4 
commence the preparation of the site for, commence the construction or 5 
supplying of a facility, or commence any modification of a facility, that 6 
may, as determined by the council, have a substantial adverse 7 
environmental effect in the state without having first obtained a 8 
certificate of environmental compatibility and public need, hereinafter 9 
referred to as a "certificate", issued with respect to such facility or 10 
modification by the council. Certificates shall not be required for (1) fuel 11 
cells built within the state with a generating capacity of two hundred 12 
fifty kilowatts or less, or (2) fuel cells built out of state with a generating 13 
capacity of ten kilowatts or less. Any facility with respect to which a 14 
certificate is required shall thereafter be built, maintained and operated 15  Raised Bill No.  6498 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3306   	2 of 4 
 
in conformity with such certificate and any terms, limitations or 16 
conditions contained therein. Notwithstanding the provisions of this 17 
chapter or title 16a, the council shall, in the exercise of its jurisdiction 18 
over the siting of generating facilities, approve by declaratory ruling (A) 19 
the construction of a facility solely for the purpose of generating 20 
electricity, other than an electric generating facility that uses nuclear 21 
materials or coal as fuel, at a site where an electric generating facility 22 
operated prior to July 1, 2004, and (B) the construction or location of any 23 
fuel cell, unless the council finds a substantial adverse environmental 24 
effect, or of any customer-side distributed resources project or facility or 25 
grid-side distributed resources project or facility with a capacity of not 26 
more than sixty-five megawatts, as long as: (i) Such project meets air and 27 
water quality standards of the Department of Energy and 28 
Environmental Protection, (ii) the council does not find a substantial 29 
adverse environmental effect, and (iii) for a solar photovoltaic facility 30 
with a capacity of [two] one or more megawatts that is approved by 31 
declaratory ruling or a solar photovoltaic facility with a capacity of 32 
sixty-five or more megawatts that is not approved by declaratory ruling, 33 
to be located on prime farmland or farmland of state-wide importance, 34 
as determined by the United States Department of Agriculture or the 35 
Commissioner of Agriculture or forestland, excluding any such facility 36 
that was selected by the Department of Energy and Environmental 37 
Protection in any solicitation issued prior to July 1, 2017, pursuant to 38 
section 16a-3f, 16a-3g or 16a-3j, the Department of Agriculture 39 
represents, in writing, to the council that such project will not materially 40 
affect the status of such land as prime farmland or farmland of state-41 
wide importance or the Department of Energy and Environmental 42 
Protection represents, in writing, to the council that such project will not 43 
materially affect the status of such land as core forest. In conducting an 44 
evaluation of a project for purposes of subparagraph (B)(iii) of this 45 
subsection, the Departments of Agriculture and Energy and 46 
Environmental Protection may consult with the United States 47 
Department of Agriculture and soil and water conservation districts. 48 
Approval of any such solar photovoltaic facility to be located on prime 49 
farmland, farmland of state-wide importance or land that is core forest 50  Raised Bill No.  6498 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3306   	3 of 4 
 
shall require the applicant to furnish a bond for all costs associated with 51 
the decommissioning of such facility. The Departments of Agriculture 52 
and Energy and Environmental Protection shall, respectively, post on 53 
the Internet web site of such agencies information concerning any 54 
application for such a facility to be located on prime farmland or 55 
farmland of state-wide importance, or land that is core forest. Such 56 
information shall include, but not be limited to, instructions for 57 
members of the public to receive status updates and information on any 58 
such applications. 59 
(b) A certificate may be transferred, subject to the approval of the 60 
council, to a person who agrees to comply with the terms, limitations 61 
and conditions contained therein. The council shall not approve any 62 
such transfer if it finds that such transfer was contemplated at or prior 63 
to the time the certificate was issued and such fact was not adequately 64 
disclosed during the certification proceeding. 65 
(c) A certificate issued pursuant to this chapter may be amended as 66 
provided in this chapter. 67 
(d) This chapter shall apply to any facility described in subdivisions 68 
(1) to (3), inclusive, of subsection (a) of section 16-50i, the construction 69 
of which is commenced on or after April 1, 1972, and to any such facility 70 
the construction of which is approved by a municipality that has 71 
commenced the sale of bonds or bond anticipation notes on or after 72 
April 1, 1972, the proceeds or part of the proceeds of which are to finance 73 
such construction. This chapter shall apply to any facility described in 74 
subdivision (4) of said subsection (a) of section 16-50i, the construction 75 
of which is commenced on or after July 1, 1983, and to any such facility 76 
the construction of which is approved by a municipality that has 77 
commenced the sale of bonds or bond anticipation notes on or after July 78 
1, 1983, the proceeds or part of the proceeds of which are to finance such 79 
construction. This chapter shall apply to any facility described in 80 
subdivisions (5) and (6) of said subsection, the construction of which is 81 
commenced on or after October 1, 1977, and to any such facility the 82 
construction of which is approved by a municipality that has 83  Raised Bill No.  6498 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3306   	4 of 4 
 
commenced the sale of bonds or bond anticipation notes on or after 84 
October 1, 1977, the proceeds or part of the proceeds of which are to 85 
finance such construction. This chapter shall apply to the modification 86 
of a facility described in subdivisions (1) to (3), inclusive, of said 87 
subsection (a) for which construction is commenced on or after April 1, 88 
1972, modifications of a facility described in subdivision (4) of said 89 
subsection (a) for which construction is commenced on or after July 1, 90 
1983, and modifications of a facility described in subdivisions (5) and (6) 91 
of said subsection (a) of section 16-50i, for which construction is 92 
commenced on or after October 1, 1977, whenever such modification 93 
either alone or in combination with existing or other proposed facility 94 
modifications may, as determined by the council, have a substantial 95 
adverse environmental effect. This chapter shall not apply to any matter 96 
over which any agency, department or instrumentality of the federal 97 
government has exclusive jurisdiction, or has jurisdiction concurrent 98 
with that of the state and has exercised such jurisdiction, to the exclusion 99 
of regulation of such matter by the state. 100 
(e) Any person intending to construct a facility excluded from one or 101 
more provisions of this chapter may, to the extent permitted by law, 102 
elect to waive such exclusion by delivering notice of such waiver to the 103 
council. Such provisions shall thereafter apply to each facility identified 104 
in such notice from the date of its receipt by the council.  105 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 16-50k 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To provide for increased review of proposals to site solar facilities on 
certain farmlands and land that is core forest. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]