House | 06/28/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2021 | Public Act 21-89 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 408 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | File Number 207 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | House Calendar Number 178 | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |