House
|
05/28/2021
|
File Number 755
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 519
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9304
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8170
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
File Number 164
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
House Calendar Number 167
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|