Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 27, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021