Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06509 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/27/2021

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	5/27/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6509 (as amended by House "A" and "B")  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SCHOOL -BASED MENTAL HEALTH 
CLINICS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Children and Families (DCF) 
and the Department of Public Health (DPH), in consultation with the 
Connecticut Association of School-based Health Centers and a DCF-
licensed children's mental health service provider, to develop a plan by 
January 1, 2022, to promote access to mental health services for 
children and youth in regions of the state that do not have access to a 
school-based health center or an expanded school health site. 
Under the bill, mental health services in the plan may include (1) 
counseling to individual students, groups, or families, to the extent 
permitted by a sponsoring facility's license or certification; (2) 
extended school-based mental health clinic hours, including after 
school, weekend, or summer hours based on community need for 
services; and (3) mental health programming for students in 
partnership with a local or regional board of education. Under the bill, 
mental health programming means age-appropriate education or 
outreach initiatives aimed at students to prevent mental illness (e.g., 
poster and flyer campaigns, films, guest speakers, or other school 
events).  
Under the bill, any mental health service provider who staffs a 
school-based mental health clinic established in partnership with a 
local or regional board of education (1) must be knowledgeable about 
social-emotional learning and restorative practices and (2) may 
participate in social-emotional learning and restorative practices 
training provided to teachers and administrators of the schools 
governed by the board.  2021HB-06509-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	5/27/21 
 
The bill requires DCF and DPH to jointly report to the Children's 
Committee by January 1, 2022, on the plan and funding sources 
available to implement it. 
*House Amendment "A" strikes the underlying bill, which would 
have required DPH to develop a plan to establish school-based mental 
health clinics and allowed the department to adopt regulations to 
establish minimum quality standards for them. 
*House Amendment "B" (1) adds provider requirements for school-
based mental health clinics established in partnership with a local or 
regional board of education and (2) requires that the report DCF and 
DPH submit to the Children's Committee include available funding 
sources to implement the plan. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
DEFINITION 
School-Based Mental Health Clinic 
Under the bill, a "school-based mental health clinic" is a clinic that: 
1. is located in or on the grounds of a school facility of a school 
district or school board or of an Indian tribe or tribal 
organization; 
2. is organized through school, community, and health provider 
relationships;  
3. is administered by a sponsoring facility (e.g., a hospital, 
community health center, or school system); and  
4. provides on-site mental, emotional, or behavioral health 
services to children and adolescents in accordance with state 
and local law, including laws relating to licensure and 
certification. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children  2021HB-06509-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	5/27/21 
 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 9 Nay 4 (03/11/2021) 
 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 32 Nay 1 (04/15/2021)