Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06510 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/23/2021

                             
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 6510 
 
Public Act No. 21-116 
 
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION 
CONCERNING CHILDREN’S BEHAVIORAL AND MENTAL HEALTH 
RESOURCES IN HOSPITAL EMERGENCY DEPARTMENTS AND 
SCHOOLS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) (1) Not later than 
December 1, 2021, the Department of Children and Families, in 
consultation with the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council 
established pursuant to section 17a-22j of the general statutes, the 
Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services, the Department 
of Public Health and the Youth Suicide Advisory Board established 
pursuant to section 17a-52 of the general statutes, shall develop 
documents concerning behavioral and mental health evaluation and 
treatment resources available to children in each mental health region 
designated pursuant to section 17a-478 of the general statutes.  
(2) Such documents shall contain, but need not be limited to, contact 
information for the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline and a list of (A) 
providers of such resources, including, but not limited to, mobile crisis 
intervention services, (B) the physical location of each provider, if 
applicable, (C) the types of services offered by each provider, and (D) 
contact information for each provider.  Substitute House Bill No. 6510 
 
Public Act No. 21-116 	2 of 3 
 
(3) The Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council shall make 
such documents available on its Internet web site and distribute such 
documents electronically to each hospital licensed pursuant to chapter 
368v of the general statutes that has an emergency department and each 
local and regional board of education.  
(b) On and after January 1, 2022, upon the discharge of any child from 
the emergency department of a hospital licensed pursuant to chapter 
368v of the general statutes, such department shall provide the parent 
or guardian of such child a copy of the document developed pursuant 
to subsection (a) of this section that pertains to the mental health region 
in which the (1) department is located, and (2) child resides, if different, 
provided such child resides in this state. Such copies shall be provided 
(A) (i) in printed form, or (ii) through such child's patient chart in the 
electronic health record system, as defined in section 19a-904c of the 
general statutes, maintained by such hospital, provided such patient 
chart was created prior to the date of such child's discharge, and (B) by 
electronic mail to the electronic mail address of such parent or guardian, 
at such parent or guardian's election. 
(c) Not later than December 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the 
Department of Children and Families shall review the documents 
developed pursuant to subsection (a) of this section and update such 
documents as necessary. If such documents are updated, the 
Department of Children and Families shall provide such updated 
documents to the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council, and 
the council shall distribute and make such updated documents available 
in the manner described in subsection (a) of this section. 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 2022, 
each local and regional board of education shall make available on such 
board's Internet web site the document developed by the Department of 
Children and Families pursuant to subsection (a) of section 1 of this act, 
concerning behavioral and mental health evaluation and treatment  Substitute House Bill No. 6510 
 
Public Act No. 21-116 	3 of 3 
 
resources available to children in the mental health region in which such 
board is located. 
(b) On and after January 1, 2022, each local and regional board of 
education shall distribute the document described in subsection (a) of 
this section (1) to any student taking a course in health and safety, and 
(2) at least semiannually, in September and May, to the parents and 
guardians of each student in the school district.