Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 7, 2021
Analysis June 4, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021