1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | LCO No. 3826 1 of 3 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6518 |
---|
7 | 7 | | January Session, 2021 |
---|
8 | 8 | | LCO No. 3826 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | Introduced by: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (HS) |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | AN ACT PROVIDING MED ICAID COVERAGE FOR C ERTIFIED |
---|
21 | 21 | | DIETITIAN-NUTRITIONISTS. |
---|
22 | 22 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
23 | 23 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
26 | 26 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 2 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid 3 |
---|
28 | 28 | | state plan to include, on and after January 1, 2009, hospice services as 4 |
---|
29 | 29 | | optional services covered under the Medicaid program. Said state plan 5 |
---|
30 | 30 | | amendment shall supersede any regulations of Connecticut state 6 |
---|
31 | 31 | | agencies concerning such optional services. Hospice services covered 7 |
---|
32 | 32 | | under the Medicaid program for individuals who are residents in long-8 |
---|
33 | 33 | | term care facilities shall be paid at a rate that is ninety-five per cent of 9 |
---|
34 | 34 | | the facility's per diem rate. 10 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) Not later than October 1, 2011, the Commissioner of Social 11 |
---|
36 | 36 | | Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include podiatry as an 12 |
---|
37 | 37 | | optional service under the Medicaid program. 13 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (c) Not later than October 1, 2014, the Commissioner of Social 14 Raised Bill No. 6518 |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | LCO No. 3826 2 of 3 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include services 15 |
---|
45 | 45 | | provided by the following licensed behavioral health clinicians in 16 |
---|
46 | 46 | | independent practice to Medicaid recipients who are twenty-one years 17 |
---|
47 | 47 | | of age or older: (1) Psychologists licensed under chapter 383, (2) clinical 18 |
---|
48 | 48 | | social workers licensed under subsection (c) or (e) of section 20-195n, (3) 19 |
---|
49 | 49 | | alcohol and drug counselors licensed under section 20-74s, (4) 20 |
---|
50 | 50 | | professional counselors licensed under sections 20-195cc and 20-195dd, 21 |
---|
51 | 51 | | and (5) marital and family therapists licensed under section 20-195c. The 22 |
---|
52 | 52 | | commissioner shall include such services as optional services covered 23 |
---|
53 | 53 | | under the Medicaid program and provide direct Medicaid 24 |
---|
54 | 54 | | reimbursements to such licensed behavioral health clinicians who are 25 |
---|
55 | 55 | | enrolled as Medicaid providers and who treat such Medicaid recipients 26 |
---|
56 | 56 | | in independent practice settings. [The commissioner may implement 27 |
---|
57 | 57 | | policies and procedures necessary to implement this subsection in 28 |
---|
58 | 58 | | advance of regulations, provided the commissioner prints notice of 29 |
---|
59 | 59 | | intent to adopt the regulations in accordance with section 17b-10 not 30 |
---|
60 | 60 | | later than twenty days after the date of implementation of such policies 31 |
---|
61 | 61 | | and procedures. Such policies and procedures shall be valid until the 32 |
---|
62 | 62 | | time final regulations are adopted.] 33 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (d) Not later than October 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Social 34 |
---|
64 | 64 | | Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include a service 35 |
---|
65 | 65 | | provided by a dietitian-nutritionist certified pursuant to section 20-206n 36 |
---|
66 | 66 | | as an optional service under the Medicaid program. 37 |
---|
67 | 67 | | (e) The Commissioner of Social Services may implement policies 38 |
---|
68 | 68 | | necessary to implement the provisions of this section while in the 39 |
---|
69 | 69 | | process of adopting such policies in regulation form, provided the 40 |
---|
70 | 70 | | commissioner posts notice of such policies on the eRegulations System 41 |
---|
71 | 71 | | in accordance with section 17b-10. Such policies shall be valid until the 42 |
---|
72 | 72 | | time final regulations are adopted. 43 |
---|
73 | 73 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
74 | 74 | | sections: |
---|
75 | 75 | | |
---|
76 | 76 | | Section 1 July 1, 2021 17b-28e |
---|
77 | 77 | | Raised Bill No. 6518 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | LCO No. 3826 3 of 3 |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
84 | 84 | | To help Medicaid beneficiaries avoid the consequences of malnutrition |
---|
85 | 85 | | by authorizing Medicaid coverage for the services of certified dietitian- |
---|
86 | 86 | | nutritionists. |
---|
87 | 87 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except |
---|
88 | 88 | | that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not |
---|
89 | 89 | | underlined.] |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|