Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06518 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/24/2021

                                
 
 
LCO No. 3826  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6518  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3826 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT PROVIDING MED ICAID COVERAGE FOR C ERTIFIED 
DIETITIAN-NUTRITIONISTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 2 
(a) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid 3 
state plan to include, on and after January 1, 2009, hospice services as 4 
optional services covered under the Medicaid program. Said state plan 5 
amendment shall supersede any regulations of Connecticut state 6 
agencies concerning such optional services. Hospice services covered 7 
under the Medicaid program for individuals who are residents in long-8 
term care facilities shall be paid at a rate that is ninety-five per cent of 9 
the facility's per diem rate. 10 
(b) Not later than October 1, 2011, the Commissioner of Social 11 
Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include podiatry as an 12 
optional service under the Medicaid program. 13 
(c) Not later than October 1, 2014, the Commissioner of Social 14  Raised Bill No.  6518 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3826   	2 of 3 
 
Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include services 15 
provided by the following licensed behavioral health clinicians in 16 
independent practice to Medicaid recipients who are twenty-one years 17 
of age or older: (1) Psychologists licensed under chapter 383, (2) clinical 18 
social workers licensed under subsection (c) or (e) of section 20-195n, (3) 19 
alcohol and drug counselors licensed under section 20-74s, (4) 20 
professional counselors licensed under sections 20-195cc and 20-195dd, 21 
and (5) marital and family therapists licensed under section 20-195c. The 22 
commissioner shall include such services as optional services covered 23 
under the Medicaid program and provide direct Medicaid 24 
reimbursements to such licensed behavioral health clinicians who are 25 
enrolled as Medicaid providers and who treat such Medicaid recipients 26 
in independent practice settings. [The commissioner may implement 27 
policies and procedures necessary to implement this subsection in 28 
advance of regulations, provided the commissioner prints notice of 29 
intent to adopt the regulations in accordance with section 17b-10 not 30 
later than twenty days after the date of implementation of such policies 31 
and procedures. Such policies and procedures shall be valid until the 32 
time final regulations are adopted.] 33 
(d) Not later than October 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Social 34 
Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include a service 35 
provided by a dietitian-nutritionist certified pursuant to section 20-206n 36 
as an optional service under the Medicaid program. 37 
(e) The Commissioner of Social Services may implement policies 38 
necessary to implement the provisions of this section while in the 39 
process of adopting such policies in regulation form, provided the 40 
commissioner posts notice of such policies on the eRegulations System 41 
in accordance with section 17b-10. Such policies shall be valid until the 42 
time final regulations are adopted. 43 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 17b-28e 
  Raised Bill No.  6518 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3826   	3 of 3 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To help Medicaid beneficiaries avoid the consequences of malnutrition 
by authorizing Medicaid coverage for the services of certified dietitian-
nutritionists. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]