Senate | 07/06/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/23/2021 | Public Act 21-118 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 558 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/03/2021 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | File Number 270 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | House Calendar Number 224 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |