14 | | - | Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is |
---|
15 | | - | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, |
---|
16 | | - | 2021): |
---|
17 | | - | (a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company |
---|
18 | | - | providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric |
---|
19 | | - | supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction |
---|
20 | | - | of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority that not less than one per |
---|
21 | | - | cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an |
---|
22 | | - | electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. |
---|
23 | | - | On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total |
---|
24 | | - | output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric |
---|
25 | | - | distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public |
---|
26 | | - | Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On or |
---|
27 | | - | after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of |
---|
28 | | - | any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution |
---|
29 | | - | company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities |
---|
30 | | - | Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after |
---|
31 | | - | January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such Substitute House Bill No. 6527 |
---|
| 18 | + | Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is 1 |
---|
| 19 | + | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 |
---|
| 20 | + | 2021): 3 |
---|
| 21 | + | (a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company 4 |
---|
| 22 | + | providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric 5 |
---|
| 23 | + | supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction 6 |
---|
| 24 | + | of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority that not less than one per 7 |
---|
| 25 | + | cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an 8 |
---|
| 26 | + | electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. 9 |
---|
| 27 | + | On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total 10 |
---|
| 28 | + | output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 11 |
---|
| 29 | + | distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 12 |
---|
| 30 | + | Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On or 13 |
---|
| 31 | + | after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of 14 |
---|
| 32 | + | any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution 15 |
---|
| 33 | + | company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities 16 |
---|
| 34 | + | Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after 17 |
---|
| 35 | + | January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such 18 |
---|
| 36 | + | supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company 19 Substitute Bill No. 6527 |
---|
35 | | - | supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company |
---|
36 | | - | shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory |
---|
37 | | - | Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, |
---|
38 | | - | 2022, until December 31, 2024, not less than five per cent of the total |
---|
39 | | - | output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric |
---|
40 | | - | distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public |
---|
41 | | - | Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. |
---|
42 | | - | Electric power obtained from customer-side distributed resources that |
---|
43 | | - | does not meet air and water quality standards of the Department of |
---|
44 | | - | Energy and Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of |
---|
45 | | - | meeting the percentage standards in this section. |
---|
| 39 | + | LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06527- |
---|
| 40 | + | R01-HB.docx } |
---|
| 41 | + | 2 of 2 |
---|
| 42 | + | |
---|
| 43 | + | shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory 20 |
---|
| 44 | + | Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 21 |
---|
| 45 | + | 2022, until December 31, 2024, not less than five per cent of the total 22 |
---|
| 46 | + | output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 23 |
---|
| 47 | + | distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 24 |
---|
| 48 | + | Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. 25 |
---|
| 49 | + | Electric power obtained from customer-side distributed resources that 26 |
---|
| 50 | + | does not meet air and water quality standards of the Department of 27 |
---|
| 51 | + | Energy and Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of 28 |
---|
| 52 | + | meeting the percentage standards in this section. 29 |
---|
| 53 | + | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
| 54 | + | sections: |
---|
| 55 | + | |
---|
| 56 | + | Section 1 July 1, 2021 16-243q(a) |
---|
| 57 | + | |
---|
| 58 | + | ET Joint Favorable Subst. |
---|