Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06527 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/24/2021

                        
 
 
 
LCO No. 3842  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6527  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3842 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ET)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE TOTAL OUTPUT OF CLASS III SOURCES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2021): 3 
(a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company 4 
providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric 5 
supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction 6 
of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority that not less than one per 7 
cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an 8 
electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. 9 
On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total 10 
output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 11 
distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 12 
Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On or 13 
after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of 14 
any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution 15 
company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities 16  Raised Bill No.  6527 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3842   	2 of 2 
 
Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after 17 
January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such 18 
supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company 19 
shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory 20 
Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 21 
2022, until January 1, 2025, not less than five per cent of the total output 22 
of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution 23 
company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities 24 
Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. Electric power 25 
obtained from customer-side distributed resources that does not meet 26 
air and water quality standards of the Department of Energy and 27 
Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of meeting the 28 
percentage standards in this section. 29 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 16-243q(a) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To increase the total output of Class III sources to five per cent between 
January 1, 2022, and January 1, 2025. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]