Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06527 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06527-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6527  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE TOTAL OUTPUT OF CLASS III SOURCES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2021): 3 
(a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company 4 
providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric 5 
supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction 6 
of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority that not less than one per 7 
cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an 8 
electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. 9 
On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total 10 
output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 11 
distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 12 
Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On or 13 
after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of 14 
any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution 15 
company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities 16 
Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after 17 
January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such 18 
supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company 19  Substitute Bill No. 6527 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06527-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory 20 
Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 21 
2022, until December 31, 2024, not less than five per cent of the total 22 
output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 23 
distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 24 
Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. 25 
Electric power obtained from customer-side distributed resources that 26 
does not meet air and water quality standards of the Department of 27 
Energy and Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of 28 
meeting the percentage standards in this section. 29 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 16-243q(a) 
 
ET Joint Favorable Subst.