Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06527 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/23/2021

                     
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 6527 
 
Public Act No. 21-118 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE TOTAL OUTPUT OF CLASS III 
SOURCES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 
2021): 
(a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company 
providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric 
supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction 
of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority that not less than one per 
cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an 
electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. 
On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total 
output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 
distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 
Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On or 
after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of 
any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution 
company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities 
Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after 
January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such  Substitute House Bill No. 6527 
 
Public Act No. 21-118 	2 of 2 
 
supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company 
shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory 
Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 
2022, until December 31, 2024, not less than five per cent of the total 
output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric 
distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public 
Utilities Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. 
Electric power obtained from customer-side distributed resources that 
does not meet air and water quality standards of the Department of 
Energy and Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of 
meeting the percentage standards in this section.