Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06527 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	4/6/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6527  
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE TOTAL OUTPUT OF CLASS III 
SOURCES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill temporarily increases, from 4% to 5%, the Class III 
procurement requirement under the state’s Renewable Portfolio 
Standard (RPS) law. The RPS generally requires the electric 
distribution companies (EDCs, i.e., Eversource and United 
Illuminating) and retail electric suppliers to obtain a portion of their 
power from certain energy resources categorized as Class I, II, and III. 
By law, Class III sources include electricity from certain combined heat 
and power systems, certain waste heat recovery systems, and 
conservation and load management programs, generally excluding 
those supported by ratepayers (CGS § 16-1(a)(38)). 
From January 1, 2022, until December 31, 2024, the bill requires the 
EDCs and suppliers to obtain 5%, rather than 4%, of the power they 
provide to customers from Class III sources. (Presumably, the Class III 
requirement reverts to 4% after 2024, but it is unclear.) 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 18 Nay 8 (03/18/2021)