House | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | File Number 94 | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 101 | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |