House | 03/12/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |