House | 04/14/2021 | File Number 436 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | House Calendar Number 328 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |