Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Special Act 21-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 85
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5573
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
File Number 44
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
House Calendar Number 66
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|