Senate | 06/05/2021 | File Number 793 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 560 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10011 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | File Number 309 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | House Calendar Number 241 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |