House | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/15/2021 | Public Act 21-71 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 466 | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | File Number 506 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | House Calendar Number 373 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |